+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 212) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-08-17 3:00PM in conference room 016.
- The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 3:05PM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor