+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor