+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 285, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 285, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, Cheape, Choy, Evans, Fale, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, McDermott, Thielen, Ward, Wooley voting no (12) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 13 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 12 No(es): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Kahele, Nishihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Solomon, L. Thielen, Slom. 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 39) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 39).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Yamashita, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cheape.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Baker, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 2:00PM in conference room 225.
- Senator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:00PM in conference room 225.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 693).
- House conferees appointed: Yamane, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Cheape.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator(s) Baker added as Co-Chair(s).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard, Kouchi, Slom.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 623).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1537) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 3:15PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1145) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Fukumoto.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-20-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 354) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 103) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kouchi, Slom.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 1:16PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor