+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, English, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS, JDC.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor