+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 86, 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Act 086, on 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Cheape, Fukumoto, Ing, Johanson, C. Lee, Lowen, Morikawa, Oshiro, Rhoads, Thielen, Ward, Wooley voting no (13) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 21 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 4 No(es): Senator(s) Green, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-30-13.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-30-13.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 12).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 12) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-26-13.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-13.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Evans, Aquino, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Solomon, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- The House Conference Managers reconsidered their previous decision to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Evans, Aquino, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting will reconsider its previous action on 04-22-13 2:10PM in conference room 225.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Evans, Aquino, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:00PM in conference room 225.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Yamane, Evans Co-Chairs; Aquino, Cheape.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Solomon, Co-Chair(s); Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Slom.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 621).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Lowen, Thielen voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1617) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Coffman, Cullen, Kawakami, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Lowen, Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-13 10:50AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-13 10:50 AM.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 04-01-13 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Hanohano, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1146) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Fukumoto.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-20-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, WAL, referral sheet 30
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 40).
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Green, Ihara, L. Thielen). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Kahele). Transmitted to House.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 02-28-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) L. Thielen).
- Reported from TIA/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 455) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 1:16PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA/WTL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor