+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 423.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:30AM in conference room 312.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-17 1:45PM in conference room 423.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Nishihara, Baker, English Co-Chairs; Taniguchi.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Yamane, Takumi, Choy Co-Chairs; Woodson, Ward.
- Re-referred to IAC, WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 45
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677).
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 578).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ito; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Say.
- The votes in CPC were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Takayama, Todd, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Say, Yamane.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 03-30-17.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-05-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for reconsideration of previous decision by CPC on 04-05-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Yamane, Fukumoto.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-22-17 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1134) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to IAC, WAL, CPC, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 361) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 825) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Kahele ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
- Reported from ETT/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ihara.
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to ETT/PSM, CPH/WAM.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:20PM in conference room 414.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT/PSM, CPH.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor