+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Act 162, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 162, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 3 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-30-13.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-30-13.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-26-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-13.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Tokioka, Onishi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:20PM in conference room 309.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Onishi, Cheape.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Kidani, Kouchi.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 618).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cheape, Fukumoto, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1619) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 3:15PM in House conference room 308.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 347) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 558) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kouchi, Tokuda.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor