+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to AEN/EDU, LBR/WAM.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from AEN/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 2:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/EDU, JDL/WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor