+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 046, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Act 046, on 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 483).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1461), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 342) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor