+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 508) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 02-18-15 2:51PM in conference room 016.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 3:00PM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDT, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.