+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1291) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Woodson.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 385).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HOU.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU/EET.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor