+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRE, WAM.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/AEN, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor