+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/AEN, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor