+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-08-17 1:40PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-07-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 3:00PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on PSM/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/CPH, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor