+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 186) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, JDC.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor