+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1361) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 378) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:00PM; 229 & Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor