+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WTL/HWN.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-15-13 8:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 03-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, CPC, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 329).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 03-05-13.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from WTL/THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 473) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-01-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom.
- The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Slom.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 225.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/THA.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor