+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 506) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor