+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDL.
- Reported from ENE/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 433) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDL.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-18-15 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 3:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/HTH, CPN/JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.