+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 959), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-11-13 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 325) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-05-13.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor