+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-14-17 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.