+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-13-17 10:15AM in conference room 229.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.