+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 423.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 2:30PM in conference room 423.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-15 2:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
- House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Kawakami, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ohno, Ward.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kahele, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Harimoto, Slom.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 589).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Keohokalole, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Kong, McKelvey, Rhoads, Say, Thielen voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1649), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308.
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1137) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Ohno, Ward.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-25-15 11:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4).
- Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 977) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 03-18-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 319) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, Kidani, Nishihara). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 884) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Dela Cruz; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-15 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDT/TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 505) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Tokuda.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on TSI deferred the measure until 02-19-15 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 02-18-15 2:51PM in conference room 016.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI deferred the measure until 02-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI deferred the measure until 02-09-15 2:45PM in conference room 225.
- The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT/TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDT/TSI, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor