+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1438), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-15-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 376) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 705) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 55) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 1:20PM in conference room 224.
- Referred to AEN, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.