+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1548) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 374) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 921) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-05-19.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor