+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 227) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.