+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 658) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/GVO, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.