+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:14PM in conference room 308.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ito, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Fale, Har, McDermott voting no (4) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1222), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla; 6 Noes: Representative(s) Har, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott; and Excused: none.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).
- Reported from EEP/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Kobayashi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Jordan, Woodson.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to EEP/HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 658) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ENE/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/JDL deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor