+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 311) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 723) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor