+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 313) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-13 2:30PM in conference room 229.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 2:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor