+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 94) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE/JDL, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor