+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 35) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor