+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 307).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 616) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 110) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor