+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The recommendation was not adopted.
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in AGL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Kouchi, English, L. Thielen; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL will hold a public decision making on 02-04-14 2:46PM in conference room 229.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor