+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS/PSM, JDC/WAM.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
- The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-17 3:00PM in conference room 016.
- Referred to HMS/PSM, JDL/WAM.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor