+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Act 111, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 111, 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 82).
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 82) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Nishimoto, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 1:30PM; CR 229.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 1:30PM; CR 229.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Chang, Misalucha.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-13-21.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 429).
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1696), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1401) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 350) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 9:30AM; 229 & Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor