+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 063, 05/28/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Act 063, on 05/28/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Pouha, Tupola voting no (3) and none excused (0).
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 13) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 13).
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cachola, Woodson, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 016.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cachola Co-Chairs; Oshiro, Woodson, Fukumoto Chang.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Taniguchi.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 577).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1643), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1207) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-25-15 2:40PM in conference room 325.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-25-15.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-23-15 2:45PM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 296) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 900) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Ruderman.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 178) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-11-15 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor