+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Act 062, on 05/28/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 062, 05/28/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 650).
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-22-15.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-22-15.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads, Cachola Co-Chairs; Har, McDermott.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 576).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1642) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308.
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1003), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 295) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Ruderman.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM, with Senator Riviere voting "Aye, with reservations."
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 39) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor