+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 087, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187).
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Act 087, on 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187).
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 96) as amended in (CD 1).
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 96).
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, LoPresti; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 11:15AM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; LoPresti, McDermott.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-16-15.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 464).
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1505), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1032) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tupola; and Excused: none.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 293) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 8:45AM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor