+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1250) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:00PM in conference room 309.
- The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-17.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 339) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 804) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 1:00PM in conference room 224.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE/AEN, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.