+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HOU/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 556) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 3:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HOU/EET, WAM.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/HOU/EET, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor