+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Conference Committee.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 169).
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 169) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:15AM in conference room 325.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 10:00AM in conference room 325.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 9:36AM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Nishimoto, Tupola.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Shimabukuro.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 458).
- Deferred until 04-16-15.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1499), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1160) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, Tupola.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:45AM in House conference room 309.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 285) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 853) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor