+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor