+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1695) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamane.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:30AM in House conference room 430.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 361) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 768) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor