+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 501) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 8:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.