+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 035, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Act 035, on 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 478).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1542), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-13 3:58PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03/27/13.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 21).
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 02-14-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor