+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 336) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 814) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, WAM.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor