+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 34) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.