+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 010, 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Act 010, on 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 516).
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1901), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 47) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 776) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor