+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 58) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-11-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WAM.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor